JESMOND DENE REAL TENNIS CLUB

Charity number: 1175362
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

(1) The promotion of community participation in healthy recreation by the provision of facilities for playing Real Tennis.public (2) To conserve, preserve and improve for the public benefit as buildings of historic interest the Real Tennis Court and house at Matthew Bank, Newcastle upon Tyne NE2 3RE and to educate the public about the history and heritage of the buildings.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £67,284
Total expenditure: £83,639

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Cumbria
  • Durham
  • Gateshead
  • Newcastle Upon Tyne City
  • North Tyneside
  • Northumberland
  • South Tyneside
  • Sunderland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 25 October 2017: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
John LARKIN Trustee 23 December 2024
None on record
Antony Richard SANDERSON Trustee 27 March 2020
None on record
Dr Paul AVERLEY Trustee 05 March 2020
None on record
Darren James SPURLING Trustee 25 April 2019
None on record
Professor John Lional TAYLOR Trustee 25 April 2019
None on record
RAMY ZACK Trustee 03 October 2017
THE BISCUIT FACTORY FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Michael Howard Trustee 03 October 2017
YOUTH MINISTRY TRUST
Received: 59 days late
MUSIC MATTERS NORTH EAST
Received: On time
NORTH HIGHBURY ALLOTMENT ASSOCIATION
Recently registered
RICHARD JOHN MACALISTER Trustee 03 October 2017
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £85.42k £60.57k £116.42k £65.97k £67.28k
Total expenditure £63.98k £59.14k £78.72k £89.34k £83.64k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £33.79k N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 23 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 23 November 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 25 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 25 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 15 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 15 November 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 11 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 11 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 13 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 13 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
71 HIGHBURY
JESMOND
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE2 3LN
Phone:
01912816854