East Cheshire Eye Society

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supporting Blind and Visually Impaired persons in the area of East Cheshire. Maintaining Resource Centre of specialist equipment. Advice and help on visual difficulties. Social and recreation activities provided.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cheshire East
Governance
- 14 September 2017: Standard registration
- 21 November 2022: Funds received from 226347 MACCLESFIELD SOCIETY FOR THE BLIND
- EAST CHESHIRE EYE SOCIETY (Working name)
- MACCLESFIELD EYE SOCIETY (Working name)
- MES (Working name)
- THE EYE SOCIETY (Working name)
- MACCLESFIELD SOCIETY FOR THE BLIND (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr scott paul BANNISTER | Trustee | 10 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
john stephen mills | Trustee | 13 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
CATHERINE ELIZABETH COSTIGAN | Trustee | 20 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
elizabeth may durham | Trustee | 19 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
pamela hodgkiss | Trustee | 15 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
COLIN HUGH FREDERICK TURNER | Trustee | 17 September 2015 |
|
|||||
martin welch | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.18k | £74.08k | £83.66k | £39.44k | £72.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £66.65k | £77.23k | £79.36k | £44.25k | £71.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £14.00k | £10.25k | £30.58k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 March 2024 | 34 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 05 March 2024 | 34 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 01 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 01 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION CONVERSION DATED 04 APR 2019 as amended on 30 Nov 2021 as amended on 23 May 2022 as amended on 03 Jun 2024
Charitable objects
1) TO PROMOTE THE WELFARE OF PEOPLE WHO ARE BLIND AND THOSE WHO HAVE SUBSTANTIALLY DEFECTIVE SIGHT 2) TO INCREASE PUBLIC AWARENESS OF THE NEEDS OF BLIND AND PARTIALLY SIGHTED PEOPLE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
11
Market Place
MACCLESFIELD
cheshire
- Phone:
- 01625422602
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window