EUSTON FOODBANK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Euston Foodbank is a food bank operating under the Trussell Trust umbrella, where volunteers redistribute donated food to people in need in our community around the Euston mainline station in the London borough of Camden. Emergency food packages are provided to people for vouchers or letters from the agency supporting them, such as citizens advice, support workers, job centre, social services.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
Governance
- 04 May 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DOROTHEA JOY HACKMAN | Chair | 04 May 2017 |
|
|||||||||||||
Natan Bram | Trustee | 21 November 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Victoria Bombas | Trustee | 09 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Canon Jeremy Trood | Trustee | 04 May 2017 |
|
|||||||||||||
DEACON Teresa Bennett | Trustee | 04 May 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £62.32k | £372.86k | £170.34k | £293.28k | £222.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £49.11k | £133.59k | £174.36k | £426.23k | £226.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £5.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 05 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 05 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 03 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 03 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 February 2021 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 04 February 2021 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 04 May 2017
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONGST PEOPLE IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF CAMDEN AND NEIGHBOURING INNER LONDON BOROUGHS OR IN OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: (A) PROVIDING EMERGENCY FOOD, ESSENTIAL TOILETRIES , AND HOUSEHOLD ITEMS TO INDIVIDUALS AND FAMILIES IN NEED AND/OR FOR DISTRIBUTION BY CHARITIES OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY. (B) SUCH OTHER MEANS, INCLUDING (BUT NOT LIMITED TO) THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT OR SIGNPOSTING TO RELEVANT INFORMATION AND OTHER ADVISORY SERVICES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
28 Phoenix Road
LONDON
NW1 1TA
- Phone:
- 02073883966
- Email:
- eustonfoodbank@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window