Financial history GOSFORTH AGRICULTURAL SOCIETY

Charity Number: 1176889
Charity reporting is up to date (61 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023
Total gross income £29.60k £13.45k £1.79k £36.70k £35.00k
Total expenditure £28.31k £2.43k £3.21k £34.13k £27.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A £4.84k £3.00k