TWELVE APOSTLES' CHURCH IN CHRIST

Charity Number: 1174575
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We teach and practice the gospel and the life of Our Lord Jesus Christ as proclaimed by the living Apostles. This includes the three main sacraments 1. Baptism by water 2. Holy Communion, conducted monthly 3. Holy Sealing, (Baptism of the holy spirit by laying on of hands by a living Apostle) conducted annually. These services are available to any member of public in the World.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £14,763
Total expenditure: £13,669

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 08 September 2017: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • TACC (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Paying staff
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
NGWARATI MASHONGA Chair 04 July 2010
None on record
NYASHA MHLANGA Trustee 05 February 2017
None on record
JASPER KANGAI Trustee 05 February 2017
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £4.50k £5.24k £5.26k £9.70k £14.76k
Total expenditure £7.68k £650 £2.30k £12.62k £13.67k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 04 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 06 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 10 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 15 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 08 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
1 MAGDALEN CLOSE
DAVENTRY
NN11 4RF
Phone:
07496462602
Website:

twelveapostleschurchinchrist.uk and www.twelveapostlescc.org