GRIMSBY ICE RINK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The promotion of community participation in healthy recreation in Grimsby and the surrounding area by the provision of facilities for ice sports.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
Total income includes £950 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- North East Lincolnshire
Governance
- 27 November 2017: Standard registration
- GIRC (Working name)
- GRIMSBY ICE RINK COMMUNITY (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOANNE ROUTH | Chair | 10 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Andrew James Brown | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD MILTON NEWBORN | Trustee | 19 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
CAROLINE LOUISE ALLAN | Trustee | 10 March 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £158.40k | £163.91k | £234.41k | £284.58k | £315.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £192.28k | £217.61k | £225.08k | £228.64k | £267.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.80k | £69.28k | £2.67k | £221 | £950 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 27 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 27 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 03 October 2024 | 95 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 03 October 2024 | 95 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 05 March 2024 | 249 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 05 March 2024 | 249 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 27 October 2022 | 119 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 27 October 2022 | 119 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 21 January 2022 | 205 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 21 January 2022 | 205 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 10 MAR 2017 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21 JUN 2017 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 17 NOV 2017
Charitable objects
1) THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION IN GRIMSBY AND THE SURROUNDING AREA BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR ICE SPORTS. 2) TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF GRIMSBY AND THE SURROUNDING AREA THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
26 SOUTH ST MARYS GATE
GRIMSBY
DN31 1LW
- Phone:
- 07825685757
- Email:
- Finance@grimsbyicerink.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window