DEESIDE NATURALISTS SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote and advance the education of the public in natural history and the conservation of Flora and Fauna on Deeside and the surrounding areas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 16 June 1980: Standard registration
- D N S (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Keith Davies | Chair | 15 November 2019 |
|
|||||
Michael John Pollard | Trustee | 04 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Noel Hughes | Trustee | 21 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ian Miller Spence | Trustee | 14 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
John Howard Briggs | Trustee | 19 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Robert Lee | Trustee | 15 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Pete Haslem | Trustee | 09 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
William Dickinson | Trustee | 05 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Alan Anthony Smethurst | Trustee | 05 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
David Colton | Trustee | 15 December 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | 31/10/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.70k | £1.07k | £6.24k | £6.76k | £7.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.93k | £5.49k | £3.71k | £4.05k | £4.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2024 | 05 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 24 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 15 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 30 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 07 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 04/06/1980 AS AMENDED ON 22/08/2006 AS AMENDED ON 14/12/2012
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE SOCIETY SHALL BE TO PROMOTE AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN NATURAL HISTORY AND THE CONSERVATION OF FLORA AND FAUNA ON DEESIDE AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS.
Area of benefit
DEESIDE AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
15 NEWTON DRIVE
BUCKLEY
CH7 3EB
- Phone:
- 01244550993
- Email:
- secretary@deenats.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window