Financial history TRINITY BAPTIST CHURCH, WOOLWICH

Charity number: 1173399
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £79.40k £88.71k £81.42k £62.61k £75.58k
Total expenditure £73.08k £82.27k £81.95k £64.26k £74.29k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £4.00k £16.75k N/A N/A