THE MORRIS FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
DONATES TO SMALL ASSOCIATIONS FOR THE CARE OF THE ELDERLY.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 29 August 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANDREW PATRICK GEORGE MORRIS | Chair | 29 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA ANNE MORRIS | Trustee | 29 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
CHARLES EDWARD WILLIAM MORRIS | Trustee | 29 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
SOPHIE PATRICIA MORRIS | Trustee | 29 August 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £308 | £2.04k | £174 | £1.10k | £17.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £960 | £2.84k | £5.43k | £6.90k | £8.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2024 | 366 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2024 | 366 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 01 November 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 01 November 2022 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 02 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2019
(These accounts |
02 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 29 Aug 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO ADVANCE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES (ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES) AS THE TRUSTEE SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO RELIEVING FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, SICKNESS AND POOR HEALTH AMONGST ELDERLY PEOPLE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
LOTUS COTTAGE FARM
THRIFT LANE
CUDHAM LANE SOUTH
CUDHAM
SEVENOAKS
TN14 7NQ
- Phone:
- 01689859340
- Email:
- patrica.morris@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window