GRINGLEY ON THE HILL COMMUNITY CENTRE MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A community centre for the use of the inhabitants of the civil parish of Gringley-on-the Hill in the county of Nottingham without distinction of political, religious or other opinions, including use for meetings, lectures and classes and for other forms of recreation and leisure time occupation with the object of improving the conditions of life for the said inhabitants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Doncaster
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 10 May 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ann-Marie Morley | Chair | 07 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
JOHN TAYLOR | Trustee | 07 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
SIMON PARKER | Trustee | 07 March 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 18 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 18 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 04 July 2024 | 34 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 04 July 2024 | 34 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 04 January 2023 | 218 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 04 January 2023 | 218 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 24 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 24 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 10 May 2017
Charitable objects
A COMMUNITY CENTRE FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE CIVIL PARISH OF GRINGLEY-ON-THE-HILL, IN THE COUNTY OF NOTTINGHAM WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES, AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Maple Lodge
Finkell Street
Gringley-on-the-Hill
Doncaster
DN10 4SF
- Phone:
- 01777818823
- Email:
- aja.maplelodge@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window