Financial history CFD (CENTRE FOR DEAF AND HARD OF HEARING PEOPLE)

Charity number: 1175054
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £321.89k £111.52k £142.03k £170.37k £292.76k
Total expenditure £159.70k £135.32k £152.43k £196.24k £214.34k
Income from government contracts £91.17k £107.25k £113.96k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £91.17k N/A £21.25k £123.57k £227.40k