CROXDALE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1173203
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We are an Association operating from Croxdale Community Centre for the benefit of the general public and more specifically, the residents of the village of Croxdale and surrounding areas, by providing recreation facilities and community support.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £63,995
Total expenditure: £75,313

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England

Governance

Registration history:
  • 30 May 2017: CIO registration
  • 25 April 2022: Funds received from 702536 CROXDALE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
jeffrey blackburn Chair 10 December 2019
None on record
PHIL SANDERSON Trustee 02 September 2024
None on record
Lynne Mcivor Trustee 04 November 2021
None on record
Eddie Williamson Trustee 01 April 2020
None on record
karen blackburn Trustee 10 December 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £20.36k £24.22k £27.84k £33.31k £64.00k
Total expenditure £18.08k £12.63k £19.25k £29.39k £75.31k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £13.90k £19.34k £13.31k £38.88k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 31 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 31 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 25 September 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 25 September 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 01 November 2022 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021

(These accounts
have been qualified)

01 November 2022 1 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 13 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 13 May 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 19 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 19 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Croxdale Community Centre
Behind rogerson tce
Croxdale
Durham
DH6 5HJ
Phone:
00000000000
Website:

No information available