Accounts and annual returns ST. CHRISTOPHER'S PTA

Charity number: 1173168
Charity reporting is overdue by 1546 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 305 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 305 days
Annual return 31 August 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 671 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 671 days
Annual return 31 August 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1036 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1036 days
Annual return 05 April 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1546 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1546 days
Annual return 05 April 2019 07 December 2020 306 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required