POSITIVE BIRTHING AND BEYOND CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We currently offer services to women and their families in Birmingham and Solihull. The services we deliver are to help empower women for preparing for birth and parenting. We deliver a range of workshops to help prepare for infant feeding, positive birth choices and parenting. We also offer one to one support to vulnerable women and online support to women in a private forum.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 30 August 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rujnita Watts | Trustee | 03 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Curtis-Spence | Trustee | 29 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Beatrice Kathleen Bennett | Trustee | 20 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
ANGELA SUZANNE RAINEY | Trustee | 16 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
RACHAEL GRANT | Trustee | 16 March 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.55k | £2.29k | £10.23k | £278 | £9.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.62k | £1.51k | £2.15k | £5.10k | £3.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 04 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 04 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 21 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 21 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 02 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 02 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 30 Aug 2017
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE GOOD HEALTH AND WELLBEING OF PREGNANT WOMEN, MOTHERS AND THEIR FAMILIES BY OFFERING SUPPORT, INFORMATION AND GUIDANCE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
254 GREGORY AVENUE
BIRMINGHAM
B29 5DR
- Phone:
- 07549155564
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window