IN SAFE HANDS RECOVERY HOUSING

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
In Safe Hands Recovery Housing charity offering those who suffer from addiction.Accommodation and support to stay off drugs and alcohol, enabling individuals to build a productive lifestyle by engaging in activities to help in budgeting, shopping, healthy eating, registration with doctors, assistance to maintain a home, training and education. Care and early education for early years, and families
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £138,212 from 1 government contract(s)
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Birmingham City
- Solihull
Governance
- 12 February 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Henna Butt | Trustee | 21 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
RACHEL ELIZABETH ADAMS | Trustee | 18 September 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £34.17k | £54.89k | £87.52k | £126.06k | £138.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £37.71k | £39.49k | £80.02k | £113.61k | £142.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £42.56k | £125.25k | £138.21k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £17.42k | £44.96k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 July 2024 | 170 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2023
(These accounts |
19 July 2024 | 170 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 February 2024 | 386 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2022
(These accounts |
21 February 2024 | 386 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 12 May 2022 | 101 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 12 May 2022 | 101 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 August 2021 | 183 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 02 August 2021 | 183 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 12 Feb 2018
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE REHABILITATION OF PEOPLE WHO ARE IN NEED OF SUPPORT TO RECOVER FROM ADDICTION TO DRUGS AND ALCOHOL, BY PROVIDING SAFE AND SECURE ACCOMMODATION FOR THEM TO LIVE WHILE ENGAGING IN A STRUCTURED DRUG AND OR ALCOHOL RECOVERY PROGRAMME.
Contact information
- Address:
-
80 Wells Green Road
SOLIHULL
West Midlands
B92 7PQ
- Phone:
- 07806827314
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window