Financial history THE EQUINOXE TRUST

Charity number: 1173473
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £329.67k £1.04m £761.69k £2.58m £879.05k
Total expenditure £74.42k £655.59k £494.68k £4.22m £58.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £834.99k £661.61k £2.58m £879.02k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £1 £0 £1 £30
Income - Other N/A £208.75k £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £655.59k £490.36k £4.22m £58.50k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A £3.79k £0 £160.97k £8.37k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £651.80k £0 £4.06m £50.00k
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £4.33k £0 £0