BRISTOL CITY OF SANCTUARY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Bristol City of Sanctuary works with organisations and individuals in Bristol to take practical activities to promote welcome and safety for all, including people seeking sanctuary fleeing from war, violence and persecution.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Bristol City
- South Gloucestershire
Governance
- 12 February 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nathalie Jaifar | Chair | 17 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Helen Kidan | Trustee | 06 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Souvik Saha | Trustee | 17 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Katie Bales | Trustee | 05 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Susana Askew | Trustee | 12 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Mary Beatty | Trustee | 10 May 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.71k | £41.75k | £35.27k | £30.52k | £36.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.98k | £22.53k | £28.41k | £34.88k | £19.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.25k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2020
(These accounts |
31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 12 Feb 2018 as amended on 15 Aug 2019
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: 1. THE PROMOTION OF SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AMONG PEOPLE WHO ARE REFUGEES AND ASYLUM SEEKERS, SOCIALLY EXCLUDED ON THE GROUNDS OF THEIR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC POSITION, BY PROMOTING AND/OR CO-ORDINATING SERVICES AND FACILITIES TO ASSIST THEM TO ADAPT WITHIN A NEW COMMUNITY 2. THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONG ASYLUM SEEKERS AND REFUGEES LIVING OR WORKING IN BRISTOL AND SURROUNDING AREAS BY ACTING AS AN UMBRELLA AND RESOURCE FOR LOCAL REFUGEE SUPPORT SERVICES, 3. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN GENERAL ABOUT THE ISSUES RELATING TO REFUGEES AND THOSE SEEKING ASYLUM AND HUMAN RIGHTS. 4. THE PROMOTION OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PROMOTING ACTIVITIES TO FOSTER UNDERSTANDING AND GOOD RELATIONS BETWEEN THE GENERAL PUBLIC AND PEOPLE SEEKING SANCTUARY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE ASSISI CENTRE
LAWFORDS GATE
BRISTOL
BS5 0RE
- Phone:
- 07341218773
- Email:
- Bristol@cityofsanctuary.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window