PCC TRENT-WINDOW PROJECT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To raise funds through donations & application to charitable bodies to cover the cost of repair & restoration to the stained glass windows of St Andrew's Church, Trent.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Dorset
Governance
- 27 July 2017: Standard registration
- 11 November 2021: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £87.00k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £81.35k | £4.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 November 2020 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 16 November 2020 | 382 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | 16 November 2020 | 382 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 25 JUL 2017
Charitable objects
ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION BY SUPPORTING AND FACILITATING THE REPAIR AND MAINTENANCE OF THE STAINED GLASS WINDOWS AT ST ANDREWS CHURCH, TRENT.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window