MOTHER GOOSE PRE-SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE CHARITY RUNS A PRE-SCHOOL. THE PRINCIPAL AIM OF MOTHER GOOSE IS TO HELP CHILDREN LEARN THROUGH PLAY. THE PRE-SCHOOL OPERATES FOR 24 AND A QUARTER HOURS A WEEK DURING TERM TIME AND IS SUBJECT TO OFSTED INSPECTIONS. THE TRUSTEES EMPLOY SUITABLY QUALIFIED STAFF TO RUN THE SCHOOL SUPPORTED BY A COMMITTEE DRAWN FROM THE PARENTS OF CHILDREN ATTENDING THE SCHOOL AND OTHER INTERESTED PERSONS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £54,133 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 23 October 2017: CIO registration
- 26 June 2018: Funds received from 803089 MOTHER GOOSE PRE-SCHOOL
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gail Davis | Trustee | 11 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Laura Catherine Hadley | Trustee | 02 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lauren Jenkinson | Trustee | 13 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sera maryann Hagger | Trustee | 18 October 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £58.99k | £51.98k | £49.49k | £47.00k | £77.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £53.00k | £45.79k | £46.01k | £54.40k | £77.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £42.32k | £36.39k | £30.97k | £54.13k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 26 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 26 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 17 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 17 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 29 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 29 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 23 Oct 2017
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY WORKS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT HAVING AS ITS OBJECTS THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN PARTICULAR BY: (1) PROMOTING THEIR CARE AND SAFETY; (2) PROMOTING THEIR EDUCATION AND PROMOTING PARENTAL INVOLVEMENT; (3) PROMOTING THEIR HEALTH AND WELLBEING; (4) PROVIDING SERVICES TO SUPPORT THEM AND THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS; (5) PROVIDING SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS HOLDING MEMBERSHIP OF THE CIO; AND (6) FURTHERING THE AIMS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL LEARNING ALLIANCE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
WIMPOLE VILLAGE HALL
CAMBRIDGE ROAD
WIMPOLE
ROYSTON
SG8 5QE
- Phone:
- 01223208527
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window