WEST DEVON SAFE HAVEN

Charity number: 1174272
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The relief of hardship amongst those granted refugee status in the borough of West Devon. To preserve and protect their physical and mental health and that of their dependants. To advance their education and training so as to advance them in life and assist them to adapt within a new community. To advance the education of the public about the issues relating to refugees and those seeking asylum.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024

Total income: £7,560
Total expenditure: £16,088

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Devon

Governance

Registration history:
  • 16 August 2017: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Peter Cyril Squire Trustee 22 June 2018
None on record
Alison Margaret Stewart Trustee 12 May 2017
None on record
DAVID THOMSON Trustee 12 May 2017
None on record
CHRISTINE DEW Trustee 12 May 2017
None on record
GILLIAN MILL Trustee 12 May 2017
None on record
WENDY MILLS-HICKS Trustee 12 May 2017
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022 31/01/2023 31/01/2024
Total gross income £10.67k £10.36k £9.15k £7.51k £7.56k
Total expenditure £14.14k £13.89k £12.54k £8.08k £16.09k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2024 24 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2024 24 November 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2023 15 January 2024 46 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2023 15 January 2024 46 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2022 07 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2022 07 November 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2021 04 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 04 November 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2020 01 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 01 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
104 Old Exeter Road
TAVISTOCK
Devon
PL19 0JD
Phone:
01822617735
Website:

No information available