Financial history FRIENDS OF HAMILTON

Charity number: 1173446
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £4.69k £28.59k £18.35k £3.66k £2.48k
Total expenditure £600 £18.15k £6.07k £0 £239
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £1.50k N/A N/A N/A