Trustees SAVE OUR SPANIELS
Charity number: 1173875

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Carole A Hewett | Trustee | 14 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Annette Joy Whitworth | Trustee | 25 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Summers | Trustee | 30 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Susan Jane Egan | Trustee | 30 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Claire Louise Kerry | Trustee | 01 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kerry Reid | Trustee | 01 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Johnson | Trustee | 01 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
LAURA HURT | Trustee | 21 July 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.