Financial history THE MAPLE TREE

Charity Number: 1174117
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £66.95k £74.33k £75.69k £105.27k £84.74k
Total expenditure £49.95k £59.27k £77.34k £84.05k £84.46k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £34.85k £28.88k £9.07k £22.97k £10.66k