THE MAPLE TREE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A Centre for under fives, their families and carers to give them the best possible start in life. Open access sessions include indoor and outdoor play focussing on child development and parental involvement, health visitor drop-in clinic, family support, family learning, work with fathers, an outreach programme and some activities for 0-10's. We aim for school readiness and improved life chances.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £10,657 from 8 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
18 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 03 August 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jane Lightfoot | Chair | 18 July 2019 |
|
|||||
DAI DAVID | Trustee | 20 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
AMY EASTHAM | Trustee | 04 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Elsom | Trustee | 26 September 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £66.95k | £74.33k | £75.69k | £105.27k | £84.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £49.95k | £59.27k | £77.34k | £84.05k | £84.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £34.85k | £28.88k | £9.07k | £22.97k | £10.66k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 12 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 03 Aug 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE; TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR YOUNG CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES WHO LIVE IN WHEATLEY AND ITS SURROUNDING AREA* AND WHO ARE IN NEED BY REASON OF AGE, ILL HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE, ASSISTANCE AND OTHER ACTIVITIES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY DECIDE FROM TIME TO TIME. TO PROVIDE RELIEF FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF RESIDENTS OF WHEATLEY AND SURROUNDING AREA WHO HAVE NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES BY PROVIDING FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS. *THE SURROUNDING VILLAGES ARE: BECKLEY, CUDDESDON, DENTON, DRAYTON, ELSFIELD, FOREST HILL, GARSINGTON, GREAT HASELEY, GREAT MILTON, HOLTON, HORSPATH, LITTLE HASELEY, LITTLE MILTON, LITTLEWORTH, MARSH BALDON, MILTON COMMON, NUNEHAM COURTENAY, RYCOTE, SHOTOVER, STANTON ST JOHN, TIDDINGTON, TOOT BALDON, WOODEATON, WATERPERRY AND WATERSTOCK.
Contact information
- Address:
-
20 Littleworth Road
Wheatley
Oxford
OX33 1NW
- Phone:
- 01865236700
- Email:
- info@mapletree.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window