Financial history CASTLE BROMWICH CHRISTADELPHIAN ECCLESIA

Charity number: 1173128
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £21.47k £9.39k £14.81k £21.63k £13.50k
Total expenditure £20.79k £12.26k £16.45k £23.97k £12.96k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A