Accounts and annual returns BESTWOOD VILLAGE HALL TRUST

Charity number: 1174357
Charity reporting is overdue by 1648 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 187 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 187 days
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 553 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 553 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 20 August 2024 659 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 31 July 2024 1004 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1648 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1648 days