COMPAS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
COMPAS Charity aims to promote social inclusion for the public benefit by working with people who are socially excluded on the grounds of their ethnic origin, religion, belief or creed by developing the capacity and skills of members of that community to assist them to integrate with and participate more fully in society.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £22,500 from 2 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cambridgeshire
- Cardiff
- Derbyshire
- Kent
- Leicestershire
- Newport City
- Cape Verde
- Czech Republic
- Slovakia
Governance
- 30 November 2017: CIO registration
- Compas Charity (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Radim Licenik | Trustee | 21 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Roman Masaryk | Trustee | 09 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Helena Ground | Trustee | 11 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Beverley Carpenter | Trustee | 20 June 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £97.97k | £114.02k | £198.72k | £305.49k | £209.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £90.34k | £82.84k | £168.11k | £284.48k | £227.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £5.37k | £55.48k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £16.97k | N/A | N/A | £81.15k | £22.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 07 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 07 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 08 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 11 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 08 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 08 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 30 Nov 2017
Charitable objects
3.1 THE OBJECTS OF COMPAS ARE: A) RELIEF IN NEED OF MEMBERS OF MIGRANT COMMUNITIES BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE, SUPPORT AND INFORMATION OR IN ANY OTHER WAY REQUIRED; AND BY ENGAGING WITH SERVICE PROVIDERS, PUBLIC BODIES, INSTITUTIONS AND ORGANISATIONS TO ENABLE THOSE ENTITIES TO BETTER ADAPT THEIR SERVICES, POLICIES AND ACTIVITIES TO THE NEEDS OF THE MIGRANT COMMUNITIES. B) PROMOTION OF SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY WORKING WITH PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED ON THE GROUNDS OF THEIR ETHNIC ORIGIN, RELIGION, BELIEF OR CREED (IN PARTICULAR, MEMBERS OF THE ROMA COMMUNITY) BY DEVELOPING THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF MEMBERS OF THAT COMMUNITY TO ASSIST THEM TO INTEGRATE WITH AND PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY. C) THE ADVANCEMENT OF CITIZENSHIP AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT BY PROMOTING A BETTER UNDERSTANDING WITHIN BRITISH SOCIETY; AND BY PROMOTING CIVIC RESPONSIBILITY, GOOD CITIZENSHIP AND VOLUNTEERING D) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING) OF PEOPLE IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT, INCLUDING BY PROMOTING THE LEARNING OF NATIVE LANGUAGES (INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO CZECH AND SLOVAK); SUPPORTING PARENTS TO ENGAGE WITH THEIR CHILDREN’S EDUCATION; AND MENTORING AND COACHING YOUNG PEOPLE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
27 Rivergate Arcade
Viersen Platz
PETERBOROUGH
PE1 1EL
- Phone:
- 01733706600
- Email:
- contact@compas.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window