MATABELELAND CHURCH LINENS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity raises funds in order to provide grants to help relieve poverty in Matabeleland through the Anglican Church, CPCA, & also to help youngsters obtain the means to further education.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 07 June 2017: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev JAMES ALWYN MARTIN CHLJ | Chair | 07 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mududzi Brian Lunga | Trustee | 22 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
DIANA ELIZABETH MARSHALL | Trustee | 07 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH MARY MARTIN | Trustee | 07 August 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.72k | £4.89k | £1.31k | £2.82k | £2.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.43k | £5.72k | £3.16k | £2.86k | £1.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 04 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 27 APR 2017 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 05 JUN 2017
Charitable objects
OBJECTS A) THE PREVENTION OF POVERTY IN MATABELELAND BY PROVIDING GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY. B) FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROMOTE EDUCATION (INCLUDING PHYSICAL TRAINING) OF PEOPLE IN MATABELELAND, PARTICULARLY THOSE AGED UNDER 25, IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT INCLUDING BY AWARDING TO SUCH PERSONS SCHOLARSHIPS, MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES OR GRANTS TENABLE AT ANY UNIVERSITY, COLLEGE OR INSTITUTION OF HIGHER OR FURTHER EDUCATION. C) TO ADVANCE SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES (ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES) AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME. {NOTHING IN THIS DEED SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CHARITY FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES & INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2015 AND/OR SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008}
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 Margetts Close
KENILWORTH
CV8 1EN
- Phone:
- 01926853120
- Email:
- matabelelinens@gmail.com
- Website:
-
matabelelandanglicandiocese.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window