Accounts and annual returns CHARLES ROLLS HERITAGE TRUST

Charity number: 1174592
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 26 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 26 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2023 15 April 2024 70 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 20 April 2024 75 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2022 26 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 30 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2021 02 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 02 July 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 04 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 04 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window