Financial history CHARLES ROLLS HERITAGE TRUST

Charity number: 1174592
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £3.65k £3.19k £7.87k £3.85k £1.23k
Total expenditure £1.95k £1.33k £174 £13.47k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £3.00k £2.03k N/A