Financial history SELLY WICK PLAYGROUP

Charity number: 510186
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2006 31/07/2007 31/07/2008 31/07/2009 31/07/2010
Total gross income £34.02k £30.64k £37.45k £43.63k £53.07k
Total expenditure £35.95k £27.33k £37.52k £45.09k £48.22k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A