Accounts and annual returns RAF BENSON COMMUNITY PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1173204
Charity reporting is overdue by 693 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 September 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 327 days
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 327 days
Annual return 01 September 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 693 days
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 693 days
Annual return 01 September 2021 09 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 01 September 2020 07 July 2021 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 01 September 2019 10 May 2021 313 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2019 Not Required