Accounts and annual returns THE MARK TOWNSEND CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1174560
Charity reporting is up to date (25 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2023 19 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2023 25 October 2024 25 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2022 18 August 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2022 18 August 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2021 21 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2021 21 July 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2020 08 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 08 August 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2019 05 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 05 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window