LEOMINSTER MEETING CENTRE (LMC)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of a day centre running a program of activities designed to help those in Leominster, the surrounding area and in Herefordshire generally who have been diagnosed with dementia, and their carers and families, live with the consequences of dementia. To advance the education of the general public in Leominster and beyond in the subject of dementia.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 August 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Herefordshire
Governance
- 21 June 2017: CIO registration
- 09 January 2024: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 09 January 2024: Funds transferred to 1187352 DEMENTIA MATTERS - HERE (FORDSHIRE)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2018 | 01/08/2019 | 01/08/2020 | 01/08/2021 | 01/08/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £73.39k | £50.42k | £76.54k | £148.81k | £114.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £39.53k | £60.56k | £73.37k | £110.06k | £113.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 August 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 August 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 01 August 2022 | 13 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 August 2022 | 13 March 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 01 August 2021 | 04 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 August 2021 | 04 February 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 01 August 2020 | 20 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 August 2020 | 20 January 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 01 August 2019 | 03 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 August 2019 | 03 January 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 21 Jun 2017
Charitable objects
(1) FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT GOOD HEALTH AND RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF THOSE WHO HAVE BEEN DIAGNOSED WITH DEMENTIA, THEIR CARERS AND FAMILIES IN LEOMINSTER AND THE SURROUNDING AREA AND MORE GENERALLY IN HEREFORDSHIRE, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF A DAY CENTRE RUNNING A PROGRAMME OF ACTIVITIES DESIGNED TO HELP THOSE DIAGNOSED WITH DEMENTIA AND THEIR CARERS AND FAMILIES LIVE WITH THE CONSEQUENCES OF DEMENTIA. (2) FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN LEOMINSTER AND BEYOND IN THE SUBJECT OF DEMENTIA.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window