INDEPENDENT DANCE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Independent Dance (ID) is one of the UK's leading artist development organisations in contemporary dance. ID offers a year-round programme that supports and challenges artists to evolve their own work for the benefit of the public; it drives artform development in the UK and advances dance as a part of cultural life in the UK.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £74,823 from 2 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
Governance
- 08 October 2018: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Yi Po Iris Chan | Chair | 11 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kimberley Harvey | Trustee | 12 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lily Fernanda Munoz-Newsome | Trustee | 30 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
NICOLA ELIZABETH HOPE CHILDS | Trustee | 02 August 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £147.58k | £146.71k | £205.54k | £192.78k | £142.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £148.11k | £130.24k | £182.49k | £191.03k | £174.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £134.97k | £111.96k | £74.82k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 15 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 06 APR 2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17 APR 2014 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 30 APR 2014 as amended on 20 Oct 2020
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE PROMOTION OF THE ARTS, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, OF THE ART OF DANCE TO ADVANCE THE ARTS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE PROMOTION OF THE ARTS, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THE ART OF DANCE
Contact information
- Address:
-
85 St. Georges Road
London
SE1 6ER
- Phone:
- 02070919650
- Email:
- info@independentdance.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window