THE GLAMORGAN FEDERATION OF YOUNG FARMERS CLUBS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
None
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

25 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Bridgend
- Cardiff
- City Of Swansea
- Merthyr Tydfil
- Neath Port Talbot
- Rhondda Cynon Taff
- Vale Of Glamorgan
Governance
- 12 December 2017: CIO registration
- CFFI MORGANNWG (Working name)
- GLAMORGAN YFC (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
25 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Catrin Howells | Trustee | 22 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lewys Robins | Trustee | 22 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rosie Gower | Trustee | 22 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Georgia Jenkins | Trustee | 22 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lowri Leyshon | Trustee | 22 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helen Simmonds | Trustee | 22 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Olivia Davies | Trustee | 22 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jack Morgan | Trustee | 22 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Leah Bevan | Trustee | 22 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Harriet Edwards | Trustee | 22 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kate Miles | Trustee | 22 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lauren David | Trustee | 22 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Milly Jane Butler | Trustee | 22 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Luke holmes | Trustee | 31 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Oliver Morgan | Trustee | 31 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ocean Bloom | Trustee | 31 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Bethan Elinor Williams | Trustee | 31 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lee Pritchard | Trustee | 31 August 2023 |
|
|||||
Emily Morgan | Trustee | 25 August 2022 |
|
|||||
Jasmin Rowlands- Lean | Trustee | 25 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
KATE James | Trustee | 22 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Annwen Williams | Trustee | 22 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
ELEN WILLIAMS | Trustee | 22 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Andrew joseph | Trustee | 22 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
IEUAN ROSSER | Trustee | 22 August 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 06 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 06 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 29 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 29 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 09 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 09 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 05 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 05 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 22 June 2021 | 22 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 22 June 2021 | 22 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 12 Dec 2017
Charitable objects
* TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN AGRICULTURE, RURAL LIFE AND AFFAIRS, INTERNATIONAL UNDERSTANDING, HOME CRAFTS, THE ENVIRONMENT, THE ARTS AND RELATED SUBJECTS; AND * IN THE INTERESTS OF THE SOCIAL WELFARE OF SUCH MEMBERS, TO PROVIDE AND PROMOTE THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATIONS, BEING FACILITIES WHICH WILL IMPROVE THEIR SPIRITUAL AND MENTAL CAPACITIES, HEALTH AND WELL-BEING, RAISE AWARENESS, SELF-RELIANCE AND INDIVIDUAL RESPONSIBILITY SO THAT THEY MAY DEVELOP AS INDIVIDUALS INTO FULL CITIZENS. * TO PROMOTE ITS ACTIVITIES THROUGH THE MEDIUMS OF ENGLISH AND WELSH AND TO ENSURE THOSE ACTIVITIES ENHANCE THE MEMBERS UNDERSTANDING AND KNOWLEDGE OF WELSH RURAL LIFE, WELSH CULTURE AND THE WELSH LANGUAGE, ALONG WITH PROVIDING AN UNDERSTANDING OF OTHER CULTURES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
GLAMORGAN YFC OFFICE
PENLLYN ESTATE FARM
LLWYNHELIG
COWBRIDGE
CF71 7FF
- Phone:
- 07779331839
- Email:
- glamorgan@yfc-wales.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window