FREESTYLE 4 AFRICA FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Encouragement of Arts for young African children. Promotion of the integrated study of the Arts and Academic Education. Provision of an online platform for members to unleash their creative potential. Development of strategic partnerships for continued investment in Education and the Arts. Education of Creativity and the Arts in all its aspects to the general public.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England
- Malawi
- Sudan
- The Gambia
- Uganda
- Zambia
Governance
- 29 January 2018: Standard registration
- F4AF (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MANSATA KURANG | Chair | 27 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr Omar Janneh | Trustee | 17 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
MUSTAFA ALI DHAR | Trustee | 27 June 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.69k | £120 | £0 | £21 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.06k | £604 | £0 | £13 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 103 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 103 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 469 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 469 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 June 2022 | 137 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 27 JUN 2017
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE PROMOTION OF THE INTEGRATED STUDY OF THE ARTS AND ACADEMIC EDUCATION FOR CHILDREN IN AFRICA. (B) TO ADVANCE, PRESENT, PROMOTE, ORGANISE, PROVIDE, MANAGE AND PRODUCE THE EDUCATION OF CREATIVITY AND THE ARTS IN ALL ITS ASPECTS INCLUDING MUSIC COMPOSITION (INSTRUMENTAL AND VOCAL), DANCE, DRAMAS, CREATIVE WRITING, POETRY, PAINTING, SCULPTURE, PHOTOGRAPHY, GRAPHIC AND CRAFT ARTS, INDUSTRIAL DESIGN, COSTUME AND FASHION DESIGN, MOTION PICTURES, OPERAS, FILMS, BROADCASTS, CONCERTS, ENTERTAINMENTS, EXHIBITIONS, TUTORIALS, SEMINARS, COURSES AND WORKSHOPS. (C) TO PROVIDE PRACTICAL AND FINANCIAL SUPPORT TO AFRICAN CHARITIES AND CREATIVE PROJECTS WHICH RAISE ASPIRATIONS AND ENABLE AFRICAN CHILDREN TO FULFIL THEIR FULL POTENTIAL IN THE AREA OF THE ARTS AND ACADEMIC EDUCATION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
98 NENE GARDENS
FELTHAM
TW13 5PJ
- Phone:
- 07922269032
- Email:
- freestyle4africa@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window