GORKHA ZILLA GURUNG SAMAJ UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, BY WORKING WITH IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY MEMBERS OF THE GORKHA NEPALESE COMMUNITY LIVING IN THE UNITED KINGDOM WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED OR AT RISK OF SOCIAL EXCLUSION ON THE GROUNDS OF THEIR ETHNIC ORIGIN AND THEIR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC POSITION, TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF SUCH PEOPLE AND ASSIST THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Recreation
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England
- Nepal
Governance
- 17 October 2017: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tekman Gurung Chairman | Chair | 11 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Saroj Gurung | Trustee | 11 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Posh Bahadur Gurung | Trustee | 11 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tul Bahadur Gurung | Trustee | 18 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gary Ghale | Trustee | 18 September 2021 |
|
|||||
THAM PARSAD GURUNG | Trustee | 03 May 2017 |
|
|||||
PANCHA BAHADUR GURUNG | Trustee | 07 March 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £37.57k | £25.85k | £24.44k | £67.06k | £64.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £40.62k | £5.98k | £25.06k | £58.64k | £61.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 April 2024 | 71 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 11 April 2024 | 71 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 February 2022 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 11 February 2022 | 11 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 12 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 12 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 07 MAR 2017 AS AMENDED ON 07 OCT 2017 as amended on 10 Jul 2020
Charitable objects
1. TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, BY WORKING WITH IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY MEMBERS OF THE GORKHA NEPALESE COMMUNITY LIVING IN THE UNITED KINGDOM WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED OR AT RISK OF SOCIAL EXCLUSION ON THE GROUNDS OF THEIR ETHNIC ORIGIN AND THEIR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC POSITION, TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF SUCH PEOPLE AND ASSIST THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY IN PARTICULAR BY: A) ADVANCING EDUCATION IN PARTICULAR BY ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF ENGLISH LANGUAGE TUITION. B) PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. C) RELIEVING SICKNESS AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP. 2. THE RELIEF AND ASSISTANCE OF PEOPLE, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY PEOPLE IN NEPAL, WHO ARE THE VICTIMS OF NATURAL OR OTHER KINDS OF DISASTER BY THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL OR OTHER ASSISTANCE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
15 Cadogan Close
HARROW
Middlesex
HA2 8JR
- Phone:
- 07878010687
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window