Financial history TEHILA TRUST

Charity number: 1176318
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £25.30k £48.87k £40.91k £86.14k £69.11k
Total expenditure £25.57k £31.81k £53.64k £66.59k £70.93k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A