LIBERTY CHOIR UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promote the rehabilitation of prisoners for the public benefit by setting up choirs in prisons to build the skills and capacity of offenders so that they can break the cycle of re-offending on release. Promote social inclusion amongst socially excluded people by providing a programme of high-quality singing to help develop skills and self-confidence to assist them to integrate into society.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
183 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 12 July 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STEPHEN JOHN MANWARING | Trustee | 01 March 2025 |
|
|||||
Oliver Huggins | Trustee | 16 June 2023 |
|
|||||
Jennifer Holden | Trustee | 22 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alexandra Felix | Trustee | 23 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
PAUL WEBSTER | Trustee | 26 April 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £172.11k | £206.44k | £162.28k | £201.79k | £349.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £153.28k | £141.00k | £158.48k | £249.82k | £268.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £3.75k | £15.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £5.00k | £1.00k | £5.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 11 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 29 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 10 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 16 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 12 Jul 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: (1) THE PROMOTION OF THE REHABILITATION OF PRISONERS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY SETTING UP CHOIRS IN PRISONS AS A MEANS TO BUILD THE SKILLS AND CAPACITY OF OFFENDERS SO THAT THEY CAN BREAK THE CYCLE OF RE-OFFENDING ON RELEASE. (2) TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AMONGST PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED THROUGH THE PROVISION OF A PROGRAMME OF HIGH-QUALITY SINGING DESIGNED TO HELP DEVELOP SKILLS AND SELF-CONFIDENCE WITH THE AIM OF ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE ‘SOCIALLY EXCLUDED’ MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF ONE OR MORE OF THE FOLLOWING FACTORS: UNEMPLOYMENT; FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; YOUTH OR OLD AGE; ILL HEALTH (PHYSICAL OR MENTAL); SUBSTANCE ABUSE OR DEPENDENCY INCLUDING ALCOHOL AND DRUGS; POOR EDUCATIONAL OR SKILLS ATTAINMENT; RELATIONSHIP AND FAMILY BREAKDOWN; POOR HOUSING (THAT IS HOUSING THAT DOES NOT MEET BASIC HABITABLE STANDARDS; CRIME (EITHER AS A VICTIM OF CRIME OR AS AN OFFENDER REHABILITATING INTO SOCIETY).
Contact information
- Address:
-
Jackson Hall
Portland Place
Hastings
East Sussex
TN34 1QN
- Phone:
- 07833581644
- Email:
- info@libertychoir.org
- Website:
-
libertychoir.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window