Accounts and annual returns The Brighton Street Community Initiative

Charity number: 1173542
Charity reporting is overdue by 1180 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 84 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 84 days
Annual return 05 April 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 450 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 450 days
Annual return 05 April 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 815 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 815 days
Annual return 05 April 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1180 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1180 days
Annual return 05 April 2020 01 April 2021 55 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 01 April 2021 55 days late Download Open in new window