The Brighton Street Community Initiative

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Working with the homeless of Brighton and Hove
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2020
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Brighton And Hove
Governance
- 23 June 2017: CIO registration
- BCNS (Working name)
- BSCI (Working name)
- BRIGHTON COMMUNITY NIGHT SHELTER (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Ramage | Chair | 23 July 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2018 | 05/04/2019 | 05/04/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.32k | £4.71k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £878 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 113 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 113 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 479 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 479 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 844 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 844 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1209 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1209 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 01 April 2021 | 55 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 01 April 2021 | 55 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 23 Jun 2017 as amended on 17 Sep 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF BRIGHTON COMMUNITY NIGHT SHELTER ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AMONGST HOMELESS PEOPLE AND ROUGH SLEEPERS IN BRIGHTON AND HOVE, BY PROVISION OF A NIGHT SHELTER, AND OTHER RELEVANT MEANS TO RELIEVE THEIR SUFFERING.
Contact information
- Address:
-
36 North Road
Preston
BRIGHTON
BN1 6SP
- Phone:
- 07905537618
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window