Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF ST PAUL'S AND ST TIMOTHY'S

Charity number: 1172986
Charity reporting is overdue by 1444 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 348 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 348 days
Annual return 31 July 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 714 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 714 days
Annual return 31 July 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1079 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1079 days
Annual return 31 July 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1444 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1444 days
Annual return 31 July 2019 07 September 2020 99 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required