FRIENDS OF ST PAUL'S AND ST TIMOTHY'S

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Friends of St Paul's and St Timothy's Catholic Infant and Junior Schools, fundraising to support extra-curricular activities and additional learning equipment for the benefit of all pupils in both schools.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2019
People

6 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Liverpool City
Governance
- 11 May 2017: Standard registration
- ST PAUL'S AND ST TIMOTHY'S PTA (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lisa Jane Flynn | Chair | 06 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Kelly Bailey | Trustee | 17 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Clare Louise Smith | Trustee | 10 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Adam Beckett | Trustee | 06 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
CARLA TAYLOR | Trustee | 17 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
MICHELLE DOYLE | Trustee | 17 March 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2018 | 31/07/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.17k | £12.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £23.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 356 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 356 days | |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 722 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 722 days | |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1087 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1087 days | |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1452 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1452 days | |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 07 September 2020 | 99 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14 MAR 2017
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY: 2.1 DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL 2.2 ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
45 Lydford Road
LIVERPOOL
L12 5HE
- Phone:
- 07919828629
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window