LLANRUMNEY PHOENIX BOXING AND COMMUNITY ACTIVITIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Community Boxing Club Community Hall and Activity Centre
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2024
Total income includes £20,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 14 November 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
COLIN ELSON | Chair | 10 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Gareth Morgan | Trustee | 31 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
ANTHONY RICHARDS | Trustee | 10 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Lee Bridgeman | Trustee | 10 November 2017 |
|
|||||
GEMMA PRICE | Trustee | 10 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
PAUL CLARKE | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2020 | 01/04/2021 | 01/04/2022 | 01/04/2023 | 01/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £15.00k | £20.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £10.00k | £18.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £20.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | 04 March 2025 | 31 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | 04 March 2025 | 31 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | 13 May 2024 | 102 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | 13 May 2024 | 102 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | 22 March 2023 | 49 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | 22 March 2023 | 49 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | 01 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2021 | 01 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 14 Nov 2017
Charitable objects
3. THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE; 3.1 PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, AGE, DISABILITY, NATIONALITY, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS; 3.2 PROMOTE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR AMATEUR BOXING IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY USING BOXING AND ITS TECHNIQUES AS A MEANS OF CHANGING PEOPLES SOCIAL OR ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES IN A POSITIVE WAY; 3.3 ESTABLISH, OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF, A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME (WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY OR OTHER PERSON OR BODY) IN FURTHERANCE OF THE OBJECTS;
Contact information
- Address:
-
Llanrumney Phoenix Boxing Club
Shaw Close
Llanrumney
CARDIFF
CF3 5NX
- Phone:
- 07899712561
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window