THIRD ANGEL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Third Angel devise original live performance, making storytelling accessible to new audiences and participants. We use drama as a tool to achieve social goals - developing creativity and communication for individuals and communities. We work with emerging artists through mentoring and teaching, targeting those from backgrounds underrepresented in the arts or who experience barriers to access.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
Total income includes £378 from 1 government contract(s) and £1,000 from 1 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 10 December 2018: Standard registration
- 07 February 2024: Removed (Does not operate)
- 07 February 2024: Funds transferred to 1201083 SIBE BY SIDE DRAMA GROUP
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £169.66k | £165.34k | £187.06k | £197.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £164.08k | £148.20k | £177.93k | £258.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £378 | |
|
Income from government grants | £120.00k | £34.66k | £4.37k | £1.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 12 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 12 January 2024 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 November 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 05 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 05 January 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 27 November 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 07 DEC 2016
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE ARTS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE PROMOTION IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, OF THE ART OF DRAMA.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window