Accounts and annual returns PROPERTY LINK FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1173479
Charity reporting is overdue by 610 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 244 days
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 244 days
Annual return 31 October 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 610 days
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 610 days
Annual return 31 October 2021 04 August 2023 338 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 04 August 2023 338 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2020 04 August 2023 703 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 04 August 2023 703 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2019 25 July 2023 1058 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 04 August 2023 1068 days late Download Open in new window