Trustees GILHAM INNES FARLOW TRUST
Charity number: 1176092

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAUL ANTHONY GILHAM | Chair | 05 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Brigadier Robin John Bacon | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Chakrabahadur Khatri | Trustee | 01 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Edward Michael Dalton Bill | Trustee | 21 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
PEARL GILHAM | Trustee | 05 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
JOHN DENNIS FENN | Trustee | 05 December 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.