THE FORDCOMBE CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education of pupils at Fordcombe Church of England Primary School by making grants available to the school towards the improvement of teaching and learning.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Kent
Governance
- 31 January 2018: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Hamilton Lloyd | Trustee | 23 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Chloe Maria Archard | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lorna Townsend | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
susan Woods | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mark Hurst | Trustee | 04 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Lisa Cornell | Trustee | 04 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Lindsay Ann Relf | Trustee | 04 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER BLACKBURN | Trustee | 17 June 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.90k | £9.35k | £8.82k | £5.64k | £5.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.50k | £1.50k | £8.45k | £1.56k | £4.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 25 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 27 JUN 2017
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS OF FORDCOMBE CHURCH OF ENGLAND PRIMARY SCHOOL BY MAKING GRANTS AVAILABLE TO THE SCHOOL TOWARDS THE IMPROVEMENT OF TEACHING AND LEARNING.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Fordcombe C of E Primary School
FORDCOMBE The Green
Fordcombe
TUNBRIDGE WELLS
TN3 0RY
- Phone:
- 01892740224
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window