NCI COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the CIO are: (1) to promote the benefit of the inhabitants of the City of Cambridge and surrounding area (the area and provide facilities in the interests of social welfare for recreation and leisure (2) to establish a Community Centre in Holland Street, Cambridge in furtherance of the Objects; (3) to promote such other charitable purposes as may from time to time be determine
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 25 September 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ian Ralls | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|||||
Jordana Learmonth | Trustee | 05 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Carol Leonardi | Trustee | 05 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Debbie Cole | Trustee | 05 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Greg Butler | Trustee | 16 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Pat Yoxen | Trustee | 16 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Taylor | Trustee | 13 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
David John Savage | Trustee | 28 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Edward Michael Joseph Papaloizou | Trustee | 08 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy Bensted | Trustee | 12 March 1974 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.60k | £43.15k | £26.38k | £22.00k | £27.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £32.20k | £34.36k | £29.22k | £35.31k | £35.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £41.94k | £16.45k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 13 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 09 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 25 Sep 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: 1) TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF THE CITY OF CAMBRIDGE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS. IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER: TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN OR MANAGE OR CO-OPERATE WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CHARITY IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS. 2) TO FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE, IN PARTICULAR BY THE MAKING OF GRANTS OR DONATIONS.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
NCI COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION CIO
HOLLAND STREET
CAMBRIDGE
CB4 3DL
- Phone:
- 01223563562
- Email:
- nciclub1885@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window